### How to Multiply Two Teen Numbers — FAST

Ever wondered if there’s a quick way to multiply two numbers in the teens, like:

**14 x 17**, or **18 x 16**?

Turns out, there is. Stick around a minute, and you’ll learn it. Let’s try it for:

**18 x 16**.

The trick involves doing two operations with the numbers in the ones place of the teen numbers. The numbers in the ones place are **8** (in the ones place of 18) and **6** (in the ones place of 16).

First, **ADD** the two digits in the ones place.

8 + 6 = **14**.

Take that sum, **14**, and add it to** 10: ** 14 + 10 = **24**.

Tack a zero on to the end. **24** becomes **240**. (Keep that number in mind.)

Next **MULTIPLY** the two digits in the ones place:

8 x 6 = **48.**

Now just add this product, **48**, to the **240.
240 + 48 = 288.**

That’s the answer. This may seem a little tricky and a little weird, at first, but it gets easy after a few times. Trust me …

O.K., fine, don’t trust me. But just try it one more time, with 14 x 17, and see for yourself.

4 + 7 = 11. 11 + 10 = 21.

21 becomes **210**.

Then 4 x 7 = **28**, and 210 + 28 = **238**.

That’s all there is to it.

Now try these:

a) 13 x 16

b) 12 x 17

c) 14 x 19

d) 12 x 19

e) 13 x 14

f) 17 x 18

g) 19 x 17

h) 15 x 19

j) 16 x 17

k) 18 x 19

Answers:

a) 13 x 16 = 208

b) 12 x 17 = 204

c) 14 x 19 = 266

d) 12 x 19 = 228

e) 13 x 14 = 182

f) 17 x 18 = 306

g) 19 x 17 = 323

h) 15 x 19 = 285

j) 16 x 17 = 272

k) 18 x 19 = 342